Tuerpe v. Slootman et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Tuerpe
Defendant: Frank Slootman, Michael Scarpelli, Benoit Dageville, Mark S Garrett, Jayshree V. Ullal, Kelly A. Kramer, Michael L. Speiser, Teresa Briggs, Carl M. Eschenbach, John D. McMahon, Snowflake, Inc., Michael P. Scarpelli and Mark S. Garrett
Case Number: 3:2024cv02502
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #10 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2024. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2024)
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Teresa Briggs, Benoit Dageville, Carl M. Eschenbach, Mark S. Garrett, Kelly A. Kramer, John D. McMahon, Michael P. Scarpelli, Frank Slootman, Snowflake, Inc., Michael L. Speiser, Jayshree V. Ullal. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2024)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P.B. Johnson (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2024)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Tuerpe.. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2024)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Tuerpe. Snowflake, Inc. served on 5/7/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2024)
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Teresa Briggs, Benoit Dageville, Carl M. Eschenbach, Mark S. Garrett, Kelly A. Kramer, John D. McMahon, Michael P. Scarpelli, Frank Slootman, Snowflake, Inc., Michael L. Speiser, Jayshree V. Ullal. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/15/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2024)
April 30, 2024 Remark - Emailed ECF for venue code change. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2024)
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Christopher Tuerpe (Amended). (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 4/29/2024)
April 26, 2024 REMARK - INTAKE CALLED FILER TO CONFIRM VENUE. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 4/25/2024)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19358231.). Filed by Christopher Tuerpe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moest, Robert) (Filed on 4/25/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuerpe v. Slootman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Tuerpe
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Slootman
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scarpelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benoit Dageville
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayshree V. Ullal
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly A. Kramer
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Speiser
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Briggs
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl M. Eschenbach
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. McMahon
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowflake, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Scarpelli
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Garrett
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?