TP-Link USA Corporation v. Netgear, Inc.
Plaintiff: TP-Link USA Corporation
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv02754
Filed: May 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2024.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 06/12/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2024)
June 11, 2024 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TP-Link USA Corporation.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 6/11/2024)
May 28, 2024 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James E. Marina representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Paul F. Brinkman representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alex Henriques representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gregory S. Arovas representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Todd M. Friedman representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James E. Marina ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19397797.) filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Marina, James) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Paul F. Brinkman ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19397779.) filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Brinkman, Paul) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Alex Henriques ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19397769.) filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Henriques, Alex) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregory S. Arovas ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19397712.) filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Arovas, Gregory) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Todd M. Friedman ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19397671.) filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Netgear, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by TP-Link USA Corporation (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by TP-Link USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent TP-Link UK Limited for TP-Link USA Corporation. (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 5/8/2024)
May 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Netgear, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19396672.). Filed by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 5/8/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TP-Link USA Corporation v. Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TP-Link USA Corporation
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Alex Henriques
Represented By: Gregory S. Arovas
Represented By: James E. Marina
Represented By: Paul Brinkman
Represented By: Brandon Hugh Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?