Blevins v. Arora et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blevins
Defendant: Palo Alto Networks Inc., Aparna Bawa, Carl Eschenbach, Lorraine Twohill, John Key, Lee Klarich, Dipak Golechha, John Donovan, Nikesh Arora, James J. Goetz, Mary Pat McCarthy, Helene D. Gayle and Nir Zuk
Petitioner: Nathan Silva
Case Number: 3:2024cv02954
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS set for August 2, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall file a notice/stipulation on the related case docket, 24-cv-01156. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 30, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2024)
June 19, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS filed by Kenneth Blevins. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/19/2024)
June 17, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Blevins.. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/24. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C24-1156 CRB, C24-2350 RFL, C24-2954 SVK. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/13/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 13, 2024 *** Judge assigned to the lowest-numbered will determined if cases are related ***#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #8 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Motion filed by Nathan Silva (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 12, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Relate Case Notice of Motion filed by Nathan Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Unopposed Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed in 3:24-cv-01156-CRB is the lowest-numbered )(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/12/2024) Modified on 6/13/2024 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/14/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2024)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on Palo Alto Networks, Inc. on 05/17/2024, filed by Kenneth Blevins. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 5/17/2024)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nikesh Arora, Aparna Bawa, John Donovan, Carl Eschenbach, Helene D. Gayle, James J. Goetz, Dipak Golechha, John Key, Lee Klarich, Mary Pat McCarthy, Palo Alto Networks Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2024)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19419000.). Filed by Kenneth Blevins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moest, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. Arora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Networks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aparna Bawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Eschenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Twohill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Klarich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipak Golechha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikesh Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Pat McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helene D. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nir Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blevins
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Silva
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?