Ryan v. X Corp
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ryan
Defendant: X CORP.
Case Number: 3:2024cv03553
Filed: June 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #25 filed byJeremy Ryan. (Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 7/31/2024)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 *** Posted in error *** please see #26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ) filed byJeremy Ryan. (Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 7/30/2024) Modified on 7/31/2024 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #22 Stipulation. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/1/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Stipulation. Thedeadline for Plaintiff to file the Opposition is now July 30, 2024, and the deadline for Defendant to file its Reply Brief is now August 13, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #20 Case Management Scheduling Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by X CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison In Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Reschedule Case Management Conference)(Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/23/2024)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT X CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS AND X CORP.S SUBSEQUENT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION filed by Jeremy Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Donna Etemadi in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time)(Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 7/23/2024)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2024. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Motion Hearing as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss reset for 8/21/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 07/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by X CORP... (Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/18/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byX CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth M. Trujillo-Jamison In Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by X CORP.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/15/2024 01:30 PM. Responses due by 7/24/2024. Replies due by 7/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim)(Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by X CORP. identifying Corporate Parent X Holdings Corp. for X CORP.. (Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ahern for Defendant (Ahern, Eileen) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby Hsu for Defendant (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison for Defendant (Trujillo-Jamison, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Ryan.. (Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons served on The Corporation Trust Co of NV - Ana Gomes, Intake Specialist on 06/19/2024, filed by Jeremy Ryan. (Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 6/21/2024)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to X CORP.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/27/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2024)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against X CORP. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19514041.). Filed by Jeremy Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Etemadi, Donna) (Filed on 6/12/2024) Modified on 6/13/2024 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. X Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X CORP.
Represented By: Kirby Hsu
Represented By: Eileen M. Ahern
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ryan
Represented By: Donna Etemadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?