Brittan et al v. Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harry L. Brittan and Nancy Brittan
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company, 3M Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC, Carrier Corporation, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Armstrong International Inc., Honeywell International Inc., FMC Corporation, Redco Corporation, Crown, Cork & Seal, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Soco-West, Inc., O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Morse Tec LLC, Paramount Global, AutoZone West, LLC, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Hills Brothers Chemical Company, AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., I.T.T. Industries, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., MetalClad Insulation LLC, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, CSK Auto, Inc., The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Brenntag West Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Crane Co., Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. and York International Corporation
Cross-Complainant: Redco Corporation and Crane Co.
Cross-Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., Morse Tec LLC, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Paramount Global, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International Inc., Aurora Pump Company, AutoZone West, LLC, Carrier Corporation, Crown, Cork & Seal, FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Hills Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Industries, Inc., I.T.T. Industries, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., MetalClad Insulation LLC, Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC, Soco-West, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps LLC and York International Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv03874
Filed: June 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2024 Filing 116 NOTICE by AutoZone West, LLC of Filing State Court Answer (Barba, Luis) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
August 6, 2024 Filing 115 Certificate of Interested Entities by AutoZone West, LLC (Barba, Luis) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
August 6, 2024 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Alfonso Barba, Barba for Defendant AutoZone West, LLC (Barba, Luis) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
August 5, 2024 Filing 113 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., a public held corporation for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2024)
August 5, 2024 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. Hugo of Alex G. Taheri (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2024)
August 5, 2024 Filing 111 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Hugo, Edward) (Filed on 8/5/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Honeywell International Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Honeywell. The Bendix Corporation. for Honeywell International Inc.. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Eric Sandgren (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024) Modified on 8/2/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2024 Filing 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair, Inc., which is a publicly traded corporation, Other Affiliate Premia Intermediate Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate CRO Cayman Investments 6, Ltd., Other Affiliate General Signal Corporation which subsequently became part of SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate Canvas SX, LLC, formerly known as SPX, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, which is not a publicly traded company, Other Affiliate Canvas Holdco, LLC is the sole member of Canvas SX, LLC. for Aurora Pump Company. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Eric Sandgren for Aurora Pump Company (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
August 1, 2024 Filing 105 NOTICE by Aurora Pump Company of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
July 31, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #104 Answer to Complaint filed by 3M Company (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2024)
July 30, 2024 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by 3M Company. (Kort, Jason) (Filed on 7/30/2024) Modified on 7/31/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2024 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company (Kort, Jason) (Filed on 7/30/2024)
July 30, 2024 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alan Kort , Jayme Long and Stephanie Peatman (Kort, Jason) (Filed on 7/30/2024)
July 26, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #100 Answer to Complaint, filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2024)
July 25, 2024 Filing 101 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, as successor in interest to Zurich Insurance Company U.S. Branch, Corporate Parent Argonaut Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company for Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.. filed by Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 7/25/2024)
July 25, 2024 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 7/25/2024) Modified on 7/26/2024. Incorrect event. (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***REMINDER TO COUNSEL: The judge's name/initials are incorrect for this filing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge's name/initials on future filings. Pursuant to #31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, all future filings shall bear the initials VC immediately after the case number.*** Re: #98 Notice of Appearance filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, #99 Notice of Appearance filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)
July 23, 2024 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Anne Cormier (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/23/2024)
July 23, 2024 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Dutton Sandgren (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 7/23/2024)
July 22, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***The judge's initials are incorrect for this filing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge's name/initials on future filings.*** Re: #95 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Armstrong International Inc., #91 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC, #92 Notice of Appearance filed by Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC, #93 Notice of Appearance filed by Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 22, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #90 Answer to Complaint filed by The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack Holding Corp., #94 Answer to Complaint filed by Armstrong International Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Davis (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/19/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dianne Calareso (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by Armstrong International Inc. (Privately Held Corporation) (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Demand for Jury Trial by Armstrong International Inc. (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024) Modified on 7/22/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2024 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Davis (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/19/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Dianne Calareso (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024)
July 19, 2024 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Pep BoysManny, Moe & Jack Holding Corp. and Icahn Enterprises L.P. for Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC. (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024) Modified text on 7/22/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2024 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Demand for Jury Trial by Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC. (Calareso, Christine) (Filed on 7/19/2024) Modified on 7/22/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2024 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Redco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Redco Corporation. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2024)
July 18, 2024 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2024)
July 18, 2024 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Redco Corporation. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2024) Modified text on 7/19/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2024 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Glassman (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/17/2024) Modified text on 7/18/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. Additionally, the judge's initials are incorrect for this filing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge's name/initials on future filings. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #82 Answer to Complaint filed by IMO Industries, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation and Corporate Parent Imo Holdings Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024) Modified on 7/17/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2024 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by IMO Industries, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024) Modified on 7/17/2024. Incorrect event. (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2024 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Martinovich (Martinovich, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Velan Valve Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re: #73 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Velan Valve Corp. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #74 Answer to Complaint filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, #72 Answer to Complaint filed by Velan Valve Corp. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Pietrykowski (Pietrykowski, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Pietrykowski (Pietrykowski, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual, Corporate Parent Utica National Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Resolute Management Inc., Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 7/15/2024) Modified text on 7/16/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF)
July 15, 2024 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 7/15/2024) Modified on 7/16/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2024 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Velan Valve Corp. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 15, 2024 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corp. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 7/15/2024) Modified on 7/16/2024. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. The stipulated request to intervene is granted. However, at this point in the proceedings, there does not appear to be any need for the insurers to appear under the name of Syd Carpenter. At a later stage in the proceedings, the intervenors may request appropriate relief under the Federal Rules of Evidence to guard against the inference barred by FRE 411. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/15/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by York International Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for York International Corporation (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for York International Corporation (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for York International Corporation (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by I.T.T. Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC and Sapphire Topco, Inc. for I.T.T. Industries, Inc.. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024) Modified on 7/12/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2024 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I.T.T. Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC for I.T.T. Industries, Inc. and Sapphire Topco, Inc. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024) Modified on 7/12/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2024 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by I.T.T. Industries, Inc.. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for ITT LLC (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for ITT LLC (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for ITT LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hills Brothers Chemical Company (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hills Brothers Chemical Company (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hills Brothers Chemical Company. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Goulds Pumps LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for Goulds Pumps LLC (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for Goulds Pumps LLC (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Goulds Pumps LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Carrier Corporation. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for Carrier Corporation (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for Carrier Corporation (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Carrier Corporation (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 11, 2024 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 7/11/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 39 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Demand for Jury Trial by Genuine Parts Company. (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to allow intervenors to file an Anser-in-Intervention on behalf of insured filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Buck on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 33 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Genuine Parts Company re #32 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons And Disclosure Statement (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial by Genuine Parts Company. (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 28 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by FMC Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group for FMC Corporation. re #27 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury Trial by FMC Corporation. (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Buck (Buck, James) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 8, 2024 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company identifying Other Affiliate General Signal Corporation which subsequently became part of SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate Pentair, Inc., which is a publicly traded corporation, Other Affiliate Canvas SX, LLC, formerly known as SPX, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, which is not a publicly traded company, Other Affiliate Canvas SX, LLC is not a publicly held corporation or other publicly held entity, Other Affiliate Canvas Holdco, LLC is the sole member of Canvas SX, LLC., Other Affiliate Premia Intermediate Holdings Inc., a Delaware corporation, a member of Canvas Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate CRO Cayman Investments 6, Ltd., a Cayman company, a member of Canvas Holdco, LLC for Aurora Pump Company. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2024)
July 8, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Eric Sandgren Natalie Garcia Lashinsky, Lisa Rickenbacher and Gilliam F. Stewart (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2024)
July 8, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re: #15 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Aurora Pump Company (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2024)
July 8, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The contact information provided within the Notice of Appearance does not match the docket sheet. Please update your personal profile(s) in ECF to ensure the most current contact information is listed.*** Re: #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Aurora Pump Company (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Morse Tec LLC.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye , Michael E. Sandgren, and Lisa L. Oberg (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morse Tec LLC identifying Other Affiliate Enstar Holdings (US) LLC, a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Enstar Group Limited for Morse Tec LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Jury Demand by Morse Tec LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024) Modified text on 7/8/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye , Michael E. Sandgren, and Lisa L. Oberg (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by MetalClad Insulation LLC identifying Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group), Other Affiliate Transport Case Insurance Company for MetalClad Insulation LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 16 Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Jury Demand by MetalClad Insulation LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 7/5/2024) Modified text on 7/8/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2024 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Eric Sandgren ,Natalie Garcia Lashinsky and Lisa M. Rickenbacher (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint With Jury Demand (Notice of Removal) by Aurora Pump Company. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024) Modified text on 7/5/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Eric Sandgren , Natalie Garcia Lashinsky, Lisa M. Rickenbacher, and Gilliam F. Stewart (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 5, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc. (Sandgren, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2024) Modified text on 7/5/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***NOTICE TO FILER: Counsel entering the case must log into their ECF account(s) and individually file their Notice of Appearance. This will automatically enter them onto the docket and enable notifications. Please amend and re-file in its entirety for additional counsel.*** Re: #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
July 2, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 7/2/2024)
July 2, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc for Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 7/2/2024)
July 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Dutton Sandgren (Sandgren, Carmen) (Filed on 7/2/2024)
July 1, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re: #6 Notice (Other), filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 JOINDER by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal,, Joinder in Defendant Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 6/28/2024) Modified on 7/1/2024. Incorrect Event (krp, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GT Global Holdings, Inc. for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. re 1 Notice of Removal,, (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 28, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety, using event: Certificate of Interested Entities/Corporate Disclosure Statement. When prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re: #2 Statement filed by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2024)
June 27, 2024 Filing 1 Answer to Removal Complaint, See Pages 142-152 of Notice of Removal. by Aurora Pump Company. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2024)
June 27, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2024)
June 27, 2024 Filing 2 Statement re 1 Notice of Removal,, Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green, Tweed & Co.. (Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/27/2024)
June 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-277217. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19564832). Filed by Green, Tweed & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G2 to Decl of Sargent's - GT Brittan, #3 Exhibit Exhibits H-L to Decl of Sargent's - GT Brittan, #4 Exhibit Exhibits M-P to Decl of Sargent's - GT Brittan, #5 Exhibit Exhibits Q-R to Decl of Sargent's - GT Brittan, #6 Exhibit Exhibits S-U2 to Decl of Sargent's - GT Brittan)(Jenkins, Charles) (Filed on 6/27/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittan et al v. Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Stephanie G Peatman
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Represented By: Jason Alan Kort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Charles W. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Alex G. Taheri
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone West, LLC
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba, Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Carmen Dutton Sandgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Colin C. West
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.T.T. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetalClad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Alex G. Taheri
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation, individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry L. Brittan
Represented By: Timothy F. Pearce
Represented By: Stuart Barron Lewis
Represented By: Hannah B. Oxley
Represented By: Anya Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Brittan
Represented By: Timothy F. Pearce
Represented By: Stuart Barron Lewis
Represented By: Hannah B. Oxley
Represented By: Anya Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Charles W. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rickenbacher
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: AutoZone West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: James Michael Buck
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Carmen Dutton Sandgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Hills Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Colin C. West
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: I.T.T. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: MetalClad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Sandgren
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Soco-West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?