Sanders v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan
Plaintiff: Jay W. Sanders
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Crane Co., Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., Warren Pumps, LLC, ITT LLC, Blackmer Pump Company and Grinnell LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv04057
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2024 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 8/19/2024)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that Case No. 24-cv-4057 AMO is related to Case No. 24-cv-4070 HSG. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 8/14/2024. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2024)
August 6, 2024 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual, Corporate Parent Utica National Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Resolute Management Inc., Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund, Corporate Parent AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, a publicly-traded company for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
August 6, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 8/6/2024)
August 2, 2024 Filing 31 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. 4:24-cv-04070-HSG WITH CASE NO. 3:24-cv-04057-AMO ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19688380.). Filed by Jay W. Sanders. (Gold, Roger) (Filed on 8/2/2024) Modified on 8/5/2024 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2024 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburg, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co.. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 22, 2024 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co.. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 22, 2024 Filing 28 Answer to Removal Complaint by Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co.. (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 22, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Glassman (Glassman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 26 Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2024 due no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ITT LLC.. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for ITT LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent InTelCo Management LLC, Other Affiliate Sapphire Topco, Inc. for ITT LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE by ITT LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Defendant ITT LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages)(Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for ITT LLC (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for ITT LLC (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for ITT LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grinnell LLC.. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc for Grinnell LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc for Grinnell LLC. (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Grinnell LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Defendant Grinnell LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages)(Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Ulloa as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Ulloa, Edward) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Giaquinto as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Giaquinto, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Jo Talarico as counsel for Grinnell LLC (Talarico, Amy) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Cunningham (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Warren Pumps, LLC of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Blackmer Pump Company of Appearance (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Blackmer Pump Company of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 10, 2024 Answer to Removal Complaint Exhibit D by Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2024)
July 9, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2024)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/05/2024. (Attachments: #1 Self Help Flyer, #2 Pro Se Handbook)(ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 5, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/19/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2024)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Corporate Parent AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 7/3/2024)
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV041073. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19586888). Filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 7/3/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc SII Copes-Vulcan
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay W. Sanders
Represented By: Roger Edward Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?