Mohamed v. Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hassan Mohamed
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC and Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv04276
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Albert Edward Peacock, III on behalf of Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC, Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC (Peacock, Albert) (Filed on 9/10/2024)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2024)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2024)
September 6, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2024)
September 6, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hassan Mohamed.. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 9/6/2024)
August 26, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Mohamed shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)
August 5, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Mohamed shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 17, 2024 #Electronic filing error. ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Hassan Mohamed, #3 Proposed Summons filed by Hassan Mohamed (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 7/16/2024)
July 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Hassan Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Llinas Negret, Carlos) (Filed on 7/16/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamed v. Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Albert Edward Peacock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC
Represented By: Albert Edward Peacock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Mohamed
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?