Wu et al v. Gannett Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Saber Khamooshi and Ryan Wu
Defendant: Gannett Co. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv05150
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICTS AND INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Saber Khamooshi, Ryan Wu (Grover, Eric) (Filed on 10/11/2024)
October 8, 2024 Filing 21 Declaration of Eric A. Grover Re Redline Comparison of Complaint and First Amended Complaint filed bySaber Khamooshi, Ryan Wu. (Grover, Eric) (Filed on 10/8/2024)
October 8, 2024 Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Gannett Co. Inc.. Filed by Ryan Wu, Saber Khamooshi. (Grover, Eric) (Filed on 10/8/2024) STAFF).
October 3, 2024 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE NOVEMBER 15, 2024 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2024)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 20, 2024. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2024)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Blake J. Steinberg is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 20, 2024. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2024)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of David L. Yohai is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2024. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2024)
September 18, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Gannett Co. Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/6/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Responses due by 10/16/2024. Replies due by 10/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Polly Grunfeld Sack, #2 Proposed Order)(Singh, David) (Filed on 9/18/2024)
September 18, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Blake Steinberg ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19859346.) filed by Gannett Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Steinberg, Blake) (Filed on 9/18/2024)
September 18, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Yohai ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19859259.) filed by Gannett Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Yohai, David) (Filed on 9/18/2024)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor.Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2024. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/3/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
September 3, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2024)
August 29, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gannett Co. Inc... (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/29/2024)
August 19, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1 filed by Gannett Co. Inc.. (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/19/2024)
August 16, 2024 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2024)
August 15, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gannett Co. Inc. re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/15/2024)
August 15, 2024 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Gannett Co. Inc. Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/15/2024)
August 15, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2024)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gannett Co. Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/14/2024)
August 14, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gannett Co. Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 (Singh, David) (Filed on 8/14/2024)
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-615921. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19728015). Filed by Gannett Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaints and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Other State Court Filings, #3 Declaration of Trisha Gosser, #4 Declaration of David R. Singh, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Singh, David) (Filed on 8/14/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu et al v. Gannett Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saber Khamooshi
Represented By: Scot Bernstein
Represented By: Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Wu
Represented By: Scot Bernstein
Represented By: Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Co. Inc.
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Blake Jacob Steinberg
Represented By: Amy Tu Quyen Le
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?