Papia v. County of Marin et al
Plaintiff: Angelina Papia
Defendant: Jaime Scardina, Anthony Baylacq, Marin County Sheriff's Office, County of Marin Department of Health and Human Services and County of Marin
Case Number: 3:2024cv06769
Filed: September 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Angelina Papia. Service waived by Jaime Scardina waiver sent on 11/13/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2024)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Angelina Papia. Service waived by County of Marin waiver sent on 11/13/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; County of Marin Department of Health and Human Services waiver sent on 11/13/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; Marin County Sheriff's Office waiver sent on 11/13/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2024)
October 30, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Angelina Papia.. (Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/30/2024)
October 21, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff hall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/4/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2024)
October 17, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT v. COUNTY OF MARIN, MARIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, SHERIFF JAMIE SCARDINA, COUNTY OF MARIN DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ANTHONY BAYLACQ and DOES 1 200, jointly and severally against Angelina Papia. Filed by Angelina Papia. (Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/17/2024)
October 1, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
October 1, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Angelina Papia . (Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/27/2024)
September 27, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our districts most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Angelina Papia (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2024)
September 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angelina Papia ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19890004.). Filed by Angelina Papia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragman, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/26/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papia v. County of Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Papia
Represented By: Lawrence Wayne Bragman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Scardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Baylacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?