Nguyen v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Huyen Nguyen
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC and Pharmacia LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv07699
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The case is stayed until February 15, 2025, in light of the JPML proceedings. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/20/24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 20, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Stayed. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 2/28/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court is inclined to stay this case until February 15, 2025, in light of the JPML proceedings. If a party has an objection to the stay, they may file a letter brief to the Court by December 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/13/24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 10 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled a Further Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, January 24, 2025, by no later than 12:00PM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2024).
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES: 24-cv-06875-VC, 24-cv-07303-VC, and 24-cv-07699-SVK. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/22/2024. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2024)
November 21, 2024 Filing 7 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2024)
November 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC, Pharmacia LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
November 6, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
November 6, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
November 5, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Huyen Nguyen (Nokes, Melinda) (Filed on 11/5/2024)
November 5, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nokes, Melinda) (Filed on 11/5/2024)
November 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC, Pharmacia LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20021284.). Filed by Huyen Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nokes, Melinda) (Filed on 11/5/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huyen Nguyen
Represented By: Melinda Davis Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?