DeLany v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Camille DeLany
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv07708
Filed: November 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Camille DeLany] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Camille DeLany] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Camille DeLany] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 6, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-01326. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC-Missouri Eastern, 4:24-cv-01326, DeLany v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 24-7708 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 486 cc: JPMDL (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert on 11/4/24. (JWD)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-486) regarding MDL 2741 by Acting Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Judge Marcella R. Lockert on 11/4/24. (JWD)
October 7, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camille DeLany. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 7, 2024 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Camille DeLany. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (LNJ)
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Camille DeLany (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10864868, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Camille DeLany. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Chief U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Matthew J. Goldstein. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLany v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille DeLany
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?