Gialouris v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Linda Gialouris
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv07710
Filed: November 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Linda Gialouris] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Linda Gialouris] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Linda Gialouris] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 6, 2024 Filing 9 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis); Case Number 4:24-cv-01328-SRC. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2741: United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis), 4:24-cv-01328-SRC, Linda Gialouris v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-07710-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-486) cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert on 11/4/24. (JWD)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-486) regarding MDL 2741 by Acting Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Judge Marcella R. Lockert on 11/4/24. (JWD)
October 8, 2024 Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: The Court orders the parties to review and comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements, located on the Eastern District of Missouri's court website: #Chief Judge Stephen R. Clark's Requirements. The undersigned periodically updates his Judge's Requirements, and the parties must ensure that they are complying with the most recent version before filing any document. Failure to comply with the requirements may result in the imposition of "sanction[s] or other disadvantage." Fed. R. Civ. P. 83(b). Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/8/2024. (LNJ)
October 7, 2024 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. (JEB)
October 7, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda Gialouris. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2024 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Linda Gialouris (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10865019, in the amount of $405.00, filed by Linda Gialouris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 4, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Matthew J. Goldstein. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gialouris v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gialouris
Represented By: Timothy Edouard Jackson
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?