Sacco v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Frederick Sacco
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv07779
Filed: November 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Frederick Sacco] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Frederick Sacco] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Frederick Sacco] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 13, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-01356. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2024 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC-Eastern Missouri, 4:24-cv-01356, Sacco v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-07779 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 487 cc: JPMDL (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2024)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert on 11/6/24. (JWD)
November 6, 2024 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-487) regarding MDL 2741 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert on 11/6/24. (JWD)
October 9, 2024 Filing 4 CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (CLH)
October 9, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frederick Sacco. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Frederick Sacco (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-10873656, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Frederick Sacco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 9, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Matthew J. Goldstein. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacco v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Sacco
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?