Alvarez et al v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Maria Ximena Diaz and Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez
Respondent: FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, NATIONAL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, United States of America, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Lincoln Financial Advisors
Case Number: 3:2024cv08079
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez, Maria Ximena Diaz re #7 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 12/4/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fidelity Investments, National Financial Services LLC, Internal Revenue Service, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lincoln Financial Advisors, United States of America. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 26, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2024)
November 19, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2024)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 CORRECTED Civil Cover Sheet by Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez, Maria Ximena Diaz RE: (1) Petition. (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/19/2024)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez, Maria Ximena Diaz RE: (1) Petition. (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/19/2024)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/18/2024)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Motion to Quash Summons against Fidelity Investments, National Financial Services LLC, Internal Revenue Service, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lincoln Financial Advisors, United States of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20059590). Filed by Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez, Maria Ximena Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/18/2024)
November 18, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Petition, filed by Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez, Maria Ximena Diaz (exl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, NATIONAL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lincoln Financial Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Ximena Diaz
Represented By: Anthony V. Diosdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mauricio Aguilar Alvarez
Represented By: Anthony V. Diosdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?