Zhang v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Jinming Zhang
Defendant: United States of America and INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 3:2024cv08210
Filed: November 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6532 IRS: Refund of Tax Penalty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2025 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2025 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (Pestovich, Connor) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 12/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jinming Zhang.. (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 12/16/2024)
December 11, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT as a matter of course against Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. Filed by Jinming Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2024)
December 9, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2024. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2024)
December 4, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jinming Zhang re #4 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 12/4/2024)
November 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2024)
November 20, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2024)
November 20, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/20/2024)
November 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REFUND OF FEDERAL PENALTY PAID against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number BCANDC-20069043). Filed by Jinming Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diosdi, Anthony) (Filed on 11/20/2024) Modified on 11/21/2024 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Connor Pestovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Connor Pestovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinming Zhang
Represented By: Anthony V. Diosdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?