Liang v. Result Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shao Zhen Liang
Defendant: Le Zhang, Chengxin Liu, Yu Xiao, Result Financial Corporation, Chunling Hing, Lan Zhang, Hui Min Gao and Lina Wu
Case Number: 3:2024cv08425
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lan Zhang, Result Financial Corporation, Chengxin Liu, Lina Wu, Hui Min Gao, Yu Xiao, Le Zhang, Chunling Hing.. (Diehl, Anthony) (Filed on 12/17/2024)
December 16, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shao Zhen Liang.. (Fredman, Peter) (Filed on 12/16/2024)
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)
December 10, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shao Zhen Liang. Service waived by All Defendants. (Fredman, Peter) (Filed on 12/10/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hui Min Gao, Chunling Hing, Chengxin Liu, Result Financial Corporation, Lina Wu, Yu Xiao, Lan Zhang, Le Zhang. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/9/2024. (kam2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Fredman, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Shao Zhen Liang . (Fredman, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2024)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20084507.). Filed by Shao Zhen Liang. (Fredman, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liang v. Result Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Zhang
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chengxin Liu
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Xiao
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Result Financial Corporation
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunling Hing
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan Zhang
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Min Gao
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Wu
Represented By: Anthony P. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shao Zhen Liang
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?