Davis v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781 et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph Davis
Defendant: Tevitia Sisifa, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Nisha Chaudry, Anthony Parker, Zachary Smith and Eric Grogans
Case Number: 3:2024cv08957
Filed: December 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
January 28, 2025 Filing 17 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or More Definite Statement ) Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byInternational Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans. (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 1/28/2025)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING DEADLINES. Replies, if any, as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or More Definite Statement. due by 1/29/2025. Hearing remains as scheduled for 3/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/21/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 21, 2025 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or More Definite Statement ) filed byAndrew Joseph Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Davis, Andrew) (Filed on 1/21/2025)
January 21, 2025 Filing 14 Response to Order to Show Cause by Andrew Joseph Davis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Davis, Andrew) (Filed on 1/21/2025)
January 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/9/2025. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2025) (Mailed to pro se 1/9/2025) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 6, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Joseph Davis.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025)
January 2, 2025 Filing 10 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION:Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/7/2025. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2025) (Mailed to pro se 1/2/2025) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans.. (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/26/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2024)(Mailed to pro se 12/18/2024) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or More Definite Statement filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/3/2025 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. Responses due by 1/2/2025. Replies due by 1/9/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/18/2024)
December 12, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/12/2024)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 11, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2024)
December 11, 2024 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans . (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/11/2024)
December 11, 2024 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Zachary Smith, Eric Grogans . (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/11/2024)
December 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CIV06412. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20132294). Filed by Zachary Smith, Nisha Chaudry, Anthony Parker, Eric Grogans, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Tevitia Sisifa. (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 12/11/2024)
December 11, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet is missing Nature of Suite. No judge assignment will be made until the document is corrected and re-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781, Zachary Smith, Anthony Parker, Nisha Chaudry, Tevitia Sisifa, Eric Grogans (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tevitia Sisifa
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 1781
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nisha Chaudry
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Parker
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Smith
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Grogans
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?