Tidwell v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Plaintiff: Edward C Tidwell
Defendant: MD Matthew Stofferahn, MD Ellen R. Evans, U. S. Centers for Medicare & Medicard Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Livanta LLC., and U. S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2024cv09067
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Rita F Lin
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2025 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Proposed] filed by Edward C Tidwell. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 2/11/2025)
February 11, 2025 Filing 20 Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiff's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed byEdward C Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 2/11/2025)
January 31, 2025 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice ; Declaration of Edward C. Tidwell; Exhibit A thru Exhibit K and Certificate of Service filed byEdward C Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/31/2025)
January 27, 2025 Filing 18 Proposed Order Granting Motion With [Proposed] Order Re Emergency Motion To Compel Defendants' Responses by Edward C Tidwell. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/27/2025)
January 27, 2025 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion With [Proposed] Order Re Emergency Motion To Compel Defendants' Responses filed by Edward C Tidwell. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. Responses due by 2/10/2025. Replies due by 2/18/2025. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/27/2025)
January 27, 2025 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses To The Freedom of Information Acts filed by Edward C Tidwell. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. Responses due by 2/10/2025. Replies due by 2/18/2025. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/27/2025)
January 17, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE by Edward C Tidwell Notice of Non-Receipt of Defendants' Responses Re: Freedom of Information Act (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/17/2025)
January 16, 2025 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff Edward C. Tidwell dated January 16, 2025 to the Honorable Judge Rita F. Lin, and the Deputy Clerk's Office . (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 13 ERRATA Re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Notice of Lawsuit and Request To Waive Service of A Summons; and Waiver of The Service of Summons by Edward C Tidwell. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 13, 2025 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Notice of Lawsuit and Request To Waive Service of A Summons; and Waiver of The Service of Summons filed by Edward C Tidwell. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/13/2025)
January 10, 2025 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff Edward C. Tidwell Re Certificate of Service of Order filed January 10, 2025 . (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/10/2025)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting #8 Administrative Motion to Modify Deadlines. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 10, 2025 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward C Tidwell.. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/10/2025)
January 7, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION [Proposed] Order to Change Deadline for Filing ADR Certification; Joint Case Management Statement etc. filed by Edward C Tidwell. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. Responses due by 1/28/2025. Replies due by 2/4/2025. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/7/2025)
January 7, 2025 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward C Tidwell (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 1/7/2025)
December 23, 2024 Filing 6 ERRATA by Edward C Tidwell. (Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 5 Letter from Edward C. Tidwell Re Certificate of Service/Email . (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Email Re Certificate of Service)(Tidwell, Edward) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), a separate screening order will be issued addressing the sufficiency of Plaintiff's claims, the issuance of the summons, and service. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/19/2024 (mkl, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edward C. Tidwell. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Ellen R. Evans, Livanta LLC.,, Matthew Stofferahn, U. S. Centers for Medicare & Medicard Services, U. S. Department of Health and Human Services. Filed by Edward C. Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Matthew Stofferahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Ellen R. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Centers for Medicare & Medicard Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanta LLC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?