Fortis Advisors LLC v. Stratasys Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Fortis Advisors LLC
Defendant: Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif and Stratasys Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2024cv09214
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. § 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Filing 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to the Fourth Declaration of Richard Zelichov and References Thereto in Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Collins Declaration, #2 Exhibit Collins Exhibit K (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit Collins Exhibit L (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit Collins Exhibit M (REDACTED), #5 Declaration Declaration of Zelichov, #6 Exhibit Zelichov Exhibit K (UNREDACTED), #7 Exhibit Zelichov Exhibit L (UNREDACTED), #8 Exhibit Zelichov Exhibit M (UNREDACTED), #9 Proposed Order)(Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2025)
February 14, 2025 Filing 28 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Stay [Action, Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Sec. 3] ) filed byStratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif. (Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2025)
February 12, 2025 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Seal Exhibits 1 and 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) Regarding ECF No. 19 ) filed byFortis Advisors LLC. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 2/12/2025)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Iqra Z. Asghar. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 7, 2025 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20328015.) filed by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Asghar, Iqra) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lily (Haeun) Kim. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 7, 2025 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20327771.) filed by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Haeun) (Filed on 2/7/2025)
February 6, 2025 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/20/2025 is continued to 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2025)
February 6, 2025 Filing 21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Seal Exhibits 1 and 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) Regarding ECF No. 19 filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard Zelichov ISO Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) Regarding ECF No. 19, #2 Declaration Declaration of John Folks ISO Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) Regarding ECF No. 19, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Sealing Request Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) Regarding ECF No. 19)(Cunningham, Emma) (Filed on 2/6/2025)
February 6, 2025 Filing 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard Zelichov In Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference)(Cunningham, Emma) (Filed on 2/6/2025)
January 30, 2025 Filing 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lily (Haeun) Kim in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed, #2 Exhibit Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order Re: Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed)(Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
January 30, 2025 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
January 30, 2025 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Stay [Action, Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Sec. 3] ) filed byFortis Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christman Rice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 1/30/2025)
January 9, 2025 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif (Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 1/9/2025)
January 8, 2025 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fortis Advisors LLC identifying Corporate Parent The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for Fortis Advisors LLC. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 1/8/2025)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #13 STIPULATION TO AMEND MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND RE-NOTICE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO STAY. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
January 6, 2025 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule and Re-Notice Hearing Date for Motion to Stay filed by Fortis Advisors LLC. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
January 6, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Stay [Action, Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Sec. 3]. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2025 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
December 30, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE:You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2025. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2024)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2024)
December 30, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2024)
December 27, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fortis Advisors LLC.. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 12/27/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 8 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Certain Exhibits to Zelichov Declaration ISO Motion to Stay and Motion to Seal] filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [of Richard Zelichov], #2 Proposed Order [Granting Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits], #3 Exhibit [H to Zelichov Declaration], #4 Exhibit [I to Zelichov Declcaration])(Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 26, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay [Action, Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Sec. 3] filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2025 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Responses due by 1/9/2025. Replies due by 1/16/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Collins ISO Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Action)(Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/26/2024)
December 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif re #1 Notice of Removal, [of Filing and Service of "Notice to State Court, Fortis Advisors LLC, and Its Counsel of Removal of Civil Action" and Service of Court's Order Setting Initial CMC and Standing Orders] (Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2025 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vered Ben Jacob ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Richard Zelichov ISO Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit A to Zelichov Decl [Sealed], #4 Exhibit D to Zelichov Decl [Sealed], #5 Exhibit E to Zelichov Decl [Sealed], #6 Exhibit F to Zelichov Decl [Sealed], #7 Proposed Order ISO Motion to Seal)(Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stratasys Ltd., Stratasys, Inc., Yoav Zeif identifying Corporate Parent Stratasys Ltd. for Stratasys, Inc.. (Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2024)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-619152. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20159786). Filed by Yoav Zeif, Stratasys, Inc., Stratasys Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Collins ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit to Collins Declaration, #3 Exhibit to Collins Declaration, #4 Declaration of Vered Ben Jacob ISO Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zelichov, Richard) (Filed on 12/19/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortis Advisors LLC v. Stratasys Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratasys, Inc.
Represented By: Richard H. Zelichov
Represented By: Emma Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoav Zeif
Represented By: Richard H. Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratasys Ltd.
Represented By: Richard H. Zelichov
Represented By: Emma Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortis Advisors LLC
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Iqra Asghar
Represented By: Haeun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?