Immigrant Legal Defense v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Immigrant Legal Defense
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2024cv09326
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2025 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Helland, Kelsey) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
January 22, 2025 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint to February 26, 2025 filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Helland, Kelsey) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
January 6, 2025 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immigrant Legal Defense (Kahn, Sarah) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
January 6, 2025 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Immigrant Legal Defense.. (Kahn, Sarah) (Filed on 1/6/2025)
December 23, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2025. (kam2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Immigrant Legal Defense (Vakili, Bardis) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vakili, Bardis) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20170337.). Injunction against the US government/official or APA vacatur requested. Filed by Immigrant Legal Defense. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakili, Bardis) (Filed on 12/23/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immigrant Legal Defense v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Legal Defense
Represented By: Sarah Kahn
Represented By: Carlos R. Holguin
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Kelsey John Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?