Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2024cv09330
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2025 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area.. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 2/6/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Jeu, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
February 4, 2025 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Jeu, Christopher) (Filed on 2/4/2025)
January 22, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Christopher Frederick Jeu on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Jeu, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
December 23, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2025. (kam2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2024)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20170982). Filed by Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2024) Modified on 12/23/2024 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Jeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Jeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area
Represented By: Victoria Celeste Petty
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Brock Joseph Seraphin
Represented By: Matthew A. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?