Carlson et al v. Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Carlson and Maya Zubkovskaya
Defendant: Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2025cv01164
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to April 16, 2025 filed by Health and Human Services. (Keough, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U. S. Department of Health and Human Services. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
February 5, 2025 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward M Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2025)
February 4, 2025 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Carlson, Douglas) (Filed on 2/4/2025)
February 4, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Order to Produce Records against Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20311932.). Filed by Douglas F. Carlson, Maya Zubkovskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlson, Douglas) (Filed on 2/4/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson et al v. Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Carlson
Represented By: Douglas Fred Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Zubkovskaya
Represented By: Douglas Fred Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michael A. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?