Sivak v. Olguin
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Defendant: Areceli M Olguin
Case Number: 3:2025cv01871
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lacey Sivak. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)
March 17, 2025 Filing 3 Petition to Proceed Without Cost Based on Imminent Danger filed by Lacey Sivak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2025)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 PETITION for An Alias Writ For An Action Compel an Official of the United States to Perform Her Duty Under 28 USC 1361 against Areceli M Olguin Filed by Lacey Sivak (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2025)
February 21, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for An Action Compel an Official of the United States to Perform Her Duty Under 28 USC 1361 against Areceli M Olguin ( Filing fee NOT PAID ). Filed by Lacey Sivak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivak v. Olguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Areceli M Olguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?