Larsen-Orta v. Contra Costa County Human Services Department et al
Plaintiff: Ragni Larsen-Orta
Defendant: Contra Costa County Human Services Department, State of California Health and Human Services Agency Department of Social Services and State of California Department of Health Care Services
Case Number: 3:2025cv02027
Filed: February 26, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Trina L Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appeal from a Judgement or Order of a United States District Court by Ragni Larsen-Orta re #5 #8 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2025) Modified on 4/24/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/31/2025. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/1/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 24, 2025 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendations and Request for Leave to File Amended Complaint #5 Report and Recommendations by Ragni Larsen-Orta. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2025) Modified on 3/26/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (kxo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2025)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ragni Larsen-Orta and REASSIGNS this case to a district judge. ; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Ragni Larsen-Orta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/11/2025. Objections due by 3/26/2025.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)copy placed in outgoing mail on 3/12/2025.
February 26, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on February 26, 2025. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 26, 2025 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ragni Larsen-Orta. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2025)
February 26, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plea for Injunction and Petition on Habeas Corpus against Contra Costa County Human Services Department, State of California Department of Health Care Services, State of California Health and Human Services Agency Department of Social Services (In Forma Pauperis Pending). Filed by Ragni Larsen-Orta. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2025)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen-Orta v. Contra Costa County Human Services Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ragni Larsen-Orta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Human Services Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Health and Human Services Agency Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?