Price v. Ayers

Petitioner: Curtis Floyd Price
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 4:1993cv00277
Filed: January 25, 1993
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: DPLC GOK
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CLAIMS XI, XII, XVI, XVIII, XXII, XXIV, XXV. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/1/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
May 18, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
April 8, 2015 224 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
November 24, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 222 Statement filed by Curtis Floyd Price. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
October 17, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/17/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
May 21, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED PETITION filed by Curtis Floyd Price. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
February 2, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON LITIGATION SCHEDULE re 194 Proposed Order filed by Curtis Floyd Price. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/2/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Floyd Price
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: David H. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?