Walker v. Martel

Petitioner: Marvin Pete Walker, Jr.
Respondent: Robert Ayers
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 4:1994cv01997
Filed: June 7, 1994
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2017 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Modifying 247 Order re Briefing Schedule for Remaining Claims. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/2017. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
April 28, 2016 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLAIMS 2D AND 20. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/28/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2015 235 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR GUILT PHASE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/27/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
November 6, 2014 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND DIRECTING MERITS BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
April 18, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROCEEDINGS POST-MANDATE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/18/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
June 1, 2011 207 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LITIGATION SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDENT'S STAY MOTION: That Petitioner's Opposition to Motion for Stay of Release-or-Retrial Order Pending Appeal is due by 06/24/11; Parties to Stipulate to Temporary Stay of Release or Retrial Order by 07/13/11; or ruling on Respondent's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal re 204 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/24/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 130 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 26, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Amended Joint Litigation Schedule for Phase III. Motion cut-off: 10/14/09; Opposition due by: 11/11/09; Reply due: 12/14/09. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2010 02:30 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009) Modified on 3/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Pete Walker, Jr.
Represented By: Nanci L. Clarence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Ayers
Represented By: Dane R. Gillete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?