Armstrong, et al v. Davis, et al
Plaintiff: John Armstrong, James Amauric, Richard Ponciano, Jack Swensen, Billy Beck, Judy Fendt, Walter Fratus, Gregory Sandoval, Darlene Madison, Peter Richardson, Steven Hill, David Rose, David Blessing, Elio Castro, Elmer Umbenhower, Raymond Hayes, Gene Horrocks, Kiah Mincey, Clifton Feathers, Willie Johnson, David Badillo, James Simmons, Flora Abrams, Joey Gough and Timothy Whisman
Defendant: Joseph C. Sandoval, James Gomez, Kyle McKinsey, Kevin Carruth, Marisela Montes, Robert Presley, California Board of Prison Term, James Nielsen, Gray Davis, Arnold Schwarzenegger, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, James Tilton and John Monday
Amicus: USA and California Correctional Peace Officers Association
Miscellaneous: Edward Swanson
Receiver: Robert Sillen and J. Clark Kelso
Case Number: 4:1994cv02307
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3218 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL REMEDIAL MEASURES AT LAC, COR, SATF, CIW, AND KVSP 2948 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/11/21. (cwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3026 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RE Docket Nos. 2978 and 2979 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/30/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2917 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken. Granting 2916 Stipulation TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ALLOW MEMORANDA IN EXCESS OF TWENTY-FIVE PAGES. Motions due by 2/28/2020, Responses due by 4/27/2020, Replies due by 5/11/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Claudia Wilken. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2841 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2839 Stipulation Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Fourth Quarter of 2018.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2674 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2672 Stipulation RE MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS EMPLOYEES PERSONNEL INFORMATION AND CORRECTIVE ACTION PLANS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2638 ORDER ON MOTION OF NON-PARTIES FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 2625 Motion to Intervene.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2624 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON 2600 MOTION TO COMPEL. (granting in part and denying in part 2600 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2623 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2622 Stipulation Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the First Quarter of 2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2620 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/9/2016. (cc: Financial) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2599 ORDER FOR PAYMENT re 2597 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Edward Swanson. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2594 ORDER REGARDING JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER by Hon. Claudia Wilken regarding 2590 Discovery Letter Brief. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2588 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT re 2584 MOTION for Payment filed by Edward Swanson. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2583 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS re 2580 Proposed Order filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2563 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting 2562 Stipulation. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2559 ORDER REGARDING COMPENSATION OF COURT EXPERT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/9/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2553 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS re 2551 Proposed Order filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2511 STIPULATED ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FOR THE FOURTH QUARTER OF 2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/27/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2509 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/18/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2496 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2436 MOTION FOR FURTHER ENFORCEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2489 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 2486 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/23/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2484 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2482 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2479 ORDER re 2463 MODIFYING JANUARY 18, 2007 INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2478 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2472 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2471 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2469 Stipulation To Change Time to File Joint Status Statement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2464 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE 2458 MOTION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2462 ORDER REVISING THE 2180 MODIFIED INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2455 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2454 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2451 [TENTATIVE] ORDER TO REVISE THE MODIFIED INJUNCTION (Docket No. 2180 ). Status Report due by 11/21/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2450 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2449 Stipulation TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY PAPERS, AND TO MOVE THE DECEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING DATE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2447 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2446 ORDER GRANTING 2433 STIPULATED ORDER CONFIRMING UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOR THE SECOND QUARTER OF 2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2421 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2420 Stipulation Regarding Prison Facilities (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2408 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/30/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2390 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Ganting 2389 Stipulation Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Third Quarter of 2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2373 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2372 Stipulation Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Second Quarter of 2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2345 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2236 MOTION FOR A FURTHER ENFORCEMENT ORDER AND DENYING 2236 MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT OF COURT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2344 ORDER REGARDING MONITORING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/3/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2312 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING ( 2235 , [2235-1], 2258 , 2260 , 2271 , 2281 , 2299 , 2301 )MOTIONS AND STIPULATIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2289 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 2280 AMENDED STIPULATION Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Fourth Quarter of 2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2278 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2257 ORDER re 2256 Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Fourth Quarter of 2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/22/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2255 ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS 2236 MOTION FOR A FURTHER ENFORCEMENT ORDER AND ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT OF COURT. Status Conference / Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/21/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2231 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE BRIEFS ADDRESSING MONITORING BY THE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/4/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2225 ORDER Granting 2224 Proposed Order Confirming Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Third Quarter of 2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2219 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS EMPLOYEES PERSONNEL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2183 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING PLAINTIFFS 2159 MOTION TO SEAL AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS 2167 MOTION TO SEAL AND 2169 STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2180 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenDENYING 2024 MOTION FOR CONTEMPT, DENYING AS MOOT 2135 MOTION TO STRIKE AND MODIFYING PERMANENT INJUNCTION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2150 ORDER Granting 2149 Proposed Order Confirming Undisputed Attorney's Fees and Costs for the First Quarter of 2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2119 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2105 MOTION AND STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 2053 MOTION AND 2055 STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2035 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, 1978 MOTION TO CORRECT OR MODIFY, DENYING 1985 MOTION TO STAY AND GRANTING 2019 MOTION TO STRIKE.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2033 ORDER Granting 2029 STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY PAPERS, AND TO MOVE THE APRIL 26, 2012 DATE, REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER HOLD Set/Reset Deadlin es as to 2024 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Holding Defendants in Contempt of Court. Responses due by 5/10/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2010 ORDER Granting 2009 Proposed Order Confirming Undisputed Attorney's Fees and Costs for the Fourth Quarter of 2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/7/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1973 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1972 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1969 ORDER Granting 1968 Proposed Order Confirming Undisputed Attorney's Fees and Costs for the Third Quarter of 2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1966 ORDER Granting 1965 Stipulation to Change the Time to File the Joint Case Statement. Status Report due by 2/15/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1951 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 ORDER Granting 1936 Stipulation re: Motion to Compel Payment of Plaintiffs' Counsel's 2011 Rates. Motions due by 11/18/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1926 ORDER GRANTING 1924 Stipulation to Change Time for Filing and Hearing Dates on Plaintiffs' 1912 Renewed Motion to Require Defendants to Track and Accommodate Needs of Armstrong Class Members Housed in County Jails and Ensure Access to a Grie vance Procedure and Motion to Enforce 2001 Permanent Injunction. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/13/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/18/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 ORDER Granting 1905 Stipulation FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING COUNTY JAIL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1892 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 1879 Motion to Quash. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 ORDER Granting 1883 Stipulation Shortening Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Quash and for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1868 ORDER Granting 1864 Stipulation REGARDING JOINT FILING OF PERIODIC STATUS STATEMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1855 ORDER Granting 1848 Stipulation EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPENSATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1853 ORDER GRANTING 1848 Stipulation EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPENSATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/4/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1847 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 1840 Defendants' Motion to Compel and GRANTING 1844 Plainitiffs' Motion for Protective Order and To Quash Defendants' Subpoenas (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1839 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 1837 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Attachments: # 1 Invoice #17766) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1838 ORDER Granting 1836 Stipulation Regarding Depositions. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1835 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 1828 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 1833 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT REPLY AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 1834 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1827 ORDER Granting 1824 Stipulation Re Procedure for Resolving Attorney's Fees Incurred on Appeal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1819 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 1818 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Attachments: # 1 January 6, 2011/Invoice # 17672) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 1798 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Attachments: # 1 November 5, 2010/Invoice # 17476) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 ORDER re 1793 Granting Stipulation Re Procedure for Resolving Attorney's Fees Incurred on Appeal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1792 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 1790 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Attachments: # 1 October 8, 2010/Invoice #17370) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 ORDER ON BRIEFING FOR ATTORNEYS FEES INCURRED ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 ORDER re 1777 Granting Stipulation continuing hearing and briefing schedule for Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Compensation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1773 ORDER re 1772 Granting Stipulation TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2010 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 ORDER re 1761 Granting Stipulation Regarding Upcoming Case Management Conference. Status Conference set for 11/16/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 ORDER re 1739 Granting Stipulation Extending Time in Which Plaintiffs May Move to Compel Compensation at 2010 Rates. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1734 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 AT 1:30 P.M.; Status Conference set for 9/7/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER re 1612 granting STIPULATION SHORTENING TIME re 1609 MOTION to Stay ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO TRACK AND ACCOMMODATE THE NEEDS OF ARMSTRONG CLASS MEMBERS AND ENSURE ACCESS TO A WORKABLE GRIEVANCE PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 1484 Motion to Require Defendants to Track and Accommodate Needs of Armstrong Class Members Housed in County Jails and Ensure Access to a Workable Grievance Procedure (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 ORDER re 1568 granting STIPULATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2009 02:30 PM. Status Conference set for 10/13/2009 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER directing Defendants to comply with July 10, 2009 order or show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/20/09. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER re 1509 granting STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/11/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 ORDER re 1479 GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Time in Which Plaintiffs May Move to Compel Certain Disputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred in 2008. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 5/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/26/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (re Transcription and Dictation Coordination Agreement) Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2009.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/15/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER RE: TRANSITION PLANNING COORDINATION AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER MODIFYING REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2008.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/30/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 ORDER re 1353 CONCERNING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BILLING STATEMENTS IN ELECTRONIC FORM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/10/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER APPROVING SPACE COORDINATION AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 ORDER re 1351 granting STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference. Status Conference set for 10/14/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/22/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/26/2008.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/15/2008.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/4/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong, et al v. Davis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Armstrong
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Amauric
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ponciano
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Swensen
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Beck
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fendt
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Fratus
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sandoval
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Madison
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Richardson
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hill
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rose
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Blessing
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elio Castro
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Umbenhower
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hayes
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Horrocks
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiah Mincey
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Feathers
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Johnson
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Badillo
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simmons
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Abrams
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Gough
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Whisman
Represented By: Holly Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Sandoval
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gomez
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle McKinsey
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Carruth
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisela Montes
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Presley
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Prison Term
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nielsen
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Davis
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tilton
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Monday
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Correctional Peace Officers Association
Represented By: Gregg McLean Adam, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Edward Swanson
Represented By: Edward W. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robert Sillen
Represented By: Martin H. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: J. Clark Kelso
Represented By: Martin H. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?