Bacigalupo v. Calderon

Petitioner: Miguel Angel Bacigalupo
Respondent: Arthur Calderon
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 4:1994cv02761
Filed: August 3, 1994
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: DPLC JBD
Presiding Judge: D. Lowell Jensen
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 221 PARTIES' PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Amended Petition due by 1/15/2016. Habeas Answer due by 4/15/2016. Traverse due by 6/17/2016. Motion for Evidentiary Hearing due by 7/1/2015. Responses due by 7/15/2016. Replies due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/28/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
July 17, 2015 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE (approving 219 Joint Case Management Statement requesting continuance). Status Conference set for 11/12/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 25, 2015 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 7/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
April 3, 2015 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CJA APPOINTMENT OF AND AUTHORITY TO PAY COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/3/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
November 24, 2014 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND LITIGATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/24/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 6, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER re 203 Order Reassigning Case (includes case caption). Signed by Executive Committee on 11/6/14. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
May 8, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Status Report. Parties are to submit a joint written report to the Court within 60 days of this order. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 5/7/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacigalupo v. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Bacigalupo
Represented By: Robert Russell Bryan
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arthur Calderon
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?