Maktab Tarighe, et al v. Kianfar, et al

Plaintiff: Maktab Tarighe Oveyssi Shah Maghsoudi, Inc. and Nader Angha
Defendant: Ali Kianfar, Nahid Kianfar and International Association of Sufism, Inc.
Case Number: 4:1995cv02881
Filed: August 11, 1995
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF VOLUNATRY DISMISSAL AND ORDER re 169 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/30/15. ***Civil Case Terminated. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 9, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND THE NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE re 167 Letter filed by MTO Shahmaghsoudi (School of Islamic Sufism) Global, Inc., Maktab Tarighat Oveyssi Shahmaghsoudi. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/9/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
December 9, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 132 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/9/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 14, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/14/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maktab Tarighe, et al v. Kianfar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maktab Tarighe Oveyssi Shah Maghsoudi, Inc.
Represented By: D. Peter Harvey
Represented By: Joseph D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nader Angha
Represented By: D. Peter Harvey
Represented By: Joseph D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Kianfar
Represented By: John Norman Dahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nahid Kianfar
Represented By: John Norman Dahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sufism, Inc.
Represented By: John Norman Dahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?