Advanced Cardiovascu v. Medtronic, Inc.

Plaintiff: Advanced Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: Scott J. Solano
Special_master: Martin R. Glick
Case Number: 4:1995cv03577
Filed: October 10, 1995
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Presiding Judge: D. Lowell Jensen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 705 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 654 Defendant's MOTION to Modify Injunction After October 29, 2008. Accordingly, the permanent injunction is amended by deleting the words"or other legal expiration of the patent", and the injunction will stay in effect only until October 29, 2008. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 10/21/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 15, 2008 703 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Statement of Recent Decision Extending Term of Patent Underlying Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 10/15/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 10, 2008 668 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Substitution of counsel, Attorney Robert Francis McCauley for Plaintiff Advanced Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. added. Attorney Hope L. Hudson; Timothy J. Malloy; Alejandro Menchaca; Eligio C. Pimentel; Richard Henry Abramson and Stephen H. Bean terminated.. Signed by Judge D. Lowell Jensen on 9/10/08. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Cardiovascu v. Medtronic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David D. Headrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Elacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Scott J. Solano
Represented By: Daniel J. Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Martin R. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?