Pena v. Meeker, et al

Case Number: 4:2000cv04009
Filed: October 31, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANT JUDITH BJORNDALS (414], 416 ) MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND FOR A NEW TRIAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
February 12, 2014 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 411 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
November 4, 2013 370 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 357 DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 30, 2013 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 358 MOTION Permitting Equipment to be Brought into the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 9, 2013 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 327 MOTIONS IN LIMINE.Re: 328 Motion to Bifurcate (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
March 18, 2013 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 322 Motion to Continue. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 6, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DECLINING 320 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE UNTIL NOVEMBER 4, 2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
January 31, 2012 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING TRIAL IN RELATED STATE COURT ACTION AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
November 30, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/24/2009. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 16, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/2009. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 19, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 218 granting STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
June 18, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO FILE ANOTHER SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 6/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
March 23, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 211 granting STIPULATION REQUESTING THAT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BE RE-SCHEDULED. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 10, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Rescheduling Further Settlement Conference to 3/30/2009 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/10/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
December 19, 2008 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Further Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/19/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 5, 2008 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 205 granting STIPULATION RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
September 16, 2008 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 200 granting STIPULATION Requesting that the Case Management Conference Be Rescheduled. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. Meeker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?