Moeller et al v. Taco Bell Corp.

Plaintiff: Francie E. Moeller, Edward Muegge, Katherine Corbett and Craig Thomas Yates
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp.
Special_master: Bob Evans
Amicus: Frederick P Nisen
Case Number: 4:2002cv05849
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 811 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT and ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Motions terminated: 810 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/2014. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
April 15, 2014 779 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 772 Ex Parte Application ; granting in part and denying in part 775 Motion for Clarification and for Pretrial Conference (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
November 21, 2013 752 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 746 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
August 12, 2013 734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/12/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 5, 2013 732 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 722 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
April 22, 2013 727 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/22/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
February 7, 2013 719 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Discovery Hearing and 717 Discovery Letter BriefPlaintiffs' Statement Concerning Additional Discovery Disputes filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 02/07/2013. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 29, 2013 715 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Discovery Letter Briefs 709 , 711 , 712 , 713 , and 714 . Discovery Hearing set for 2/6/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/29/2013. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 22, 2013 710 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 709 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 01/22/2013. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
September 17, 2012 691 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 642 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/17/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 26, 2012 680 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 611 Motion to Decertify Class; denying 646 Motion to Amend/Alter Certification (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
January 19, 2012 665 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: CLASS DEPOSITIONS 659 664 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/19/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
December 7, 2011 659 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Discovery Status Conference 656 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/7/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 30, 2011 656 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE Re: 654 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/30/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 28, 2011 654 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 648 MOTION Briefing Schedule Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Briefing Schedule filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/28/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 9, 2011 647 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Modifying Discovery Procedures 634 and Denying Motion for Sanctions 627 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/9/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 17, 2011 645 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Deposition of Darlene York 643 644 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/17/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 5, 2011 642 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/5/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 8, 2011 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Shortening Time for Opposition re 616 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/8/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
May 23, 2011 582 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO USE EQUIPMENT AND DEMONSTRATIVE DEVICES AT TRIAL re 581 Notice (Other) filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/23/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 16, 2011 580 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/16/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 10, 2011 578 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
December 20, 2010 544 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 12, 2010 539 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEPOSITIONS re 537 Stipulation, filed by Taco Bell Corp., Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/12/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 22, 2010 528 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 527 Statement, filed by Taco Bell Corp., Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/22/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
April 5, 2010 524 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BIFURCATION OF DISCOVERY AND EXEMPLAR TRIAL re 523 Stipulation filed by Taco Bell Corp. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 8, 2010 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ISSUE NOTICE TO THE CLASS CONCERNING THE UPCOMING TRIAL re 516 Stipulation filed by Taco Bell Corp., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 513 MOTION for Leave to Issue Notice to the Class Concerning the Upcoming Trial. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2010 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
December 23, 2009 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 458 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 481 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 10, 2009 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/10/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 6, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 473 Objection filed by Taco Bell Corp.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/6/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 477 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/5/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 2, 2009 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/2/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 27, 2009 472 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 465 Statement filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 22, 2009 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 454 Objection. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/22/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 452 Statement, filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/22/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
June 11, 2009 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 426 Notice (Other) filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/11/09. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
December 11, 2008 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 418 Notice (Other) filed by Edward Muegge, Francie E. Moeller, Katherine Corbett, Craig Thomas Yates. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/11/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 7, 2008 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 404 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller et al v. Taco Bell Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francie E. Moeller
Represented By: Timothy P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Muegge
Represented By: Timothy P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Corbett
Represented By: Timothy P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Thomas Yates
Represented By: Timothy P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp.
Represented By: Richard Hidehito Hikida, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Bob Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Frederick P Nisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?