Browne v. San Francisco Sheriffs Department

Plaintiff: Darren Browne
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriffs Department, Madden, Huntoon, Im, Balmy, Rodriguez, Wong, Sung, Butler, James, Jackie, Lisa, Linda, Evangelica, Bacari, Castro, Miller, Fields, Prato, Murphy, Sanprano, Forde, Freeman, Peacoo, Paddillia, Bliss and Ma
Case Number: 4:2003cv00047
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 25. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/22/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 1, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/1/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
May 13, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 107 Motion to Strike ; denying 111 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 26, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/26/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 24, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Reimbursement of Costs Pursuant to General Order 25. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to reimburse plaintiff's counsel Harriet Ross in the amount of $625.00. Signed by Judge White on 2/23/09. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
December 5, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 95 Stipulation Amending Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule And Hearing (Motion for summary judgment to be filed on 1/28/09. Opposition due on 2/11/09. Reply brief due on 2/18/09. Summary judgment hearing 3/4/09 @ 9:00 a.m.) Date filed by Fields, Madden, Castro, Miller, Freeman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamiltion on 12/4/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 3, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION re 92 Stipulation filed by Fields, Madden, Castro, Miller, Freeman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/3/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne v. San Francisco Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Browne
Represented By: Harriet Pauline Ross, Esq,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madden
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntoon
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Im
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balmy
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wong
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelica
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacari
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castro
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fields
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prato
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanprano
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forde
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peacoo
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paddillia
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bliss
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?