United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company et al v. The Scott Companies, Inc. et al
Case Number: 4:2003cv05376
Filed: November 26, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE 5/4/11 HEARING. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING 3/23/11 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO SELL re 412 Stipulation, filed by St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co., United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, Joseph Anthony Guglielmo, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER, Motions terminated: 403 MOTION appointment of process servers filed by St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Company, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co., United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESET MOTION FROM 2/23/11 to 3/23/11. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO SELL SECURITIES TO PARTIALLY SATISFY PLAINTIFFS' JUDGMENT AGAINST GUGLIELMO. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER re 394 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company et al v. The Scott Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?