Paypal, Inc. v. Pitcock Featured Case

Petitioner: Paypal, Inc.
Respondent: Jason Pitcock
Case Number: 4:2004cv00431
Filed: January 30, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2007 14 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jerome M. Yalon, Jr (Yalon, Jerome) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
September 7, 2004 13 AMENDED JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD, signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/07/2004. Judgment is entered in favor of Petitioner PAYPAL, INC. and against Defendant/Respondent JASON PITCOCK. (sbasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2004)
August 27, 2004 12 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Smolar, Curtis) (Filed on 8/27/2004)
May 14, 2004 11 JUDGMENT, signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/14/2004 re 9 . IT IS ORDERED THAT final judgment shall be entered in favor of Petitioner, Paypal, Inc., and against Respondent, Jason Pitcock, in accordance with the Court's 9 Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. (sbasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2004) Modified on 5/17/2004 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2004 10 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 58 filed by Paypal, Inc. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2004)
April 29, 2004 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 4 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. IT IS SO ORDERED. (sbasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2004)
April 27, 2004 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Petitioner's Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re 7 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2004)
April 20, 2004 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paypal, Inc. re 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 4 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award, 1 Petition (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2004 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2004 01:00 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2004)
March 23, 2004 6 Renotice of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Paypal, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2004 01:00 PM. (Smolar, Curtis) (Filed on 3/23/2004) Modified on 3/24/2004 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2004 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re 1 (Attachments: ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 11, 2004 4 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Paypal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2004 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Curtis E. Molar in Support of Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration Award# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Proposed Order Proposed Order# 13 Proof of Service)(Smolar, Curtis) (Filed on 2/11/2004)
February 6, 2004 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2004 03:00 PM.via telephone. (lrc, ) (Filed on 2/6/2004)
January 30, 2004 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (kk, ) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2004. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2004 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - SBA)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award; No Process against Jason Pitcock (Filing fee $150 receipt number 3356211). Filed by Paypal, Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2004 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paypal, Inc. v. Pitcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paypal, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome Michael Yalon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Pitcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?