Doe 1 et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 4:2004cv01511
Filed: April 19, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY 150 *** ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (137) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; DENYING (199) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; DENYING (233) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; DENYING (126) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010) Modified on 6/2/2010 (cwlc2, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 643 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/28/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ***FILED IN ERROR, SHOULD ONLY BE FILED IN C-07-5985-CW*** ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; denying (167) Motion to Seal Document in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 625 STIPULATION AND ORDER. DENIED by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/26/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 618 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/23/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?