Kingdom v. Lamerque

Petitioner: Miltonous Kingdom
Respondent: A. A. Lamerque
Miscellaneous: People of the State of California
Case Number: 4:2004cv02342
Filed: June 15, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/13/09. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 7, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 20 Motion to Vacate (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 17, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EVIDENCE SUBMITTED WITH PETITIONER'S REPLY. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/17/08. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingdom v. Lamerque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miltonous Kingdom
Represented By: Charles Gretsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. A. Lamerque
Represented By: John Raikes Vance, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?