United States of America v. Prospero Ventures, L.P.

Case Number: 4:2004cv04351
Filed: October 14, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
July 21, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Approving Procedures for Winding Up and Terminating Receivership. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/21/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 55 Motion for Entry of Order Approving and Confirming the Fourth Receiver's Report for the Period of 09/01/08 to 08/31/09. All pending matters are TERMINATED. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) Modified on 2/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 50 Motion to Reopen Case and to Consider Entry of an Order Approving and Confirming Third Receiver's Report for Period of 09/01/07 Through 08/31/08. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2006 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 18 Motion (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Prospero Ventures, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?