Meaux v. Northwest Airlines, Inc.

Case Number: 4:2004cv04444
Filed: October 20, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 159 MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 160 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
April 22, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Proof of Service as to Defendant Professional Flight Attendants Association (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
March 2, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 133 granting Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice as to Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendant Northwest. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/2/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 24, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 129 Letter, filed by Northwest Airlines, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 18, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting in Part and Denying in Part 66 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 3, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER RE REQUEST TO BRING CIVIL CONTEMPT PROCEEDINGS re 114 Letter, filed by Northwest Airlines, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 28, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 109 Letter filed by Northwest Airlines, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/28/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 21, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 106 DENYING STIPULATION to be excused from ADR, ENE process. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/21/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 13, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 103 Letter filed by Northwest Airlines, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 1, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 granting STIPULATION to Continue Deadline for ENE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 25, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 12/03/09 and Defendant' Reply Brief is due by 12/17/09, re 74 Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/25/2009. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009) Modified on 11/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 GRANTING Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 16, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (8 in 4:09-cv-02447-CW) GRANTING DEFENDANT NORTHWESTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Docket No. 8). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meaux v. Northwest Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?