Taverniti et al v. Astrue

Case Number: 4:2004cv04932
Filed: November 19, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $11,318.19. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: (32 in 4:08-cv-05564-SBA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Maraina Arik, (35 in 4:08-cv-05564-SBA) MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs under 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) filed by Maraina Arik, (96 in 4:04-cv-04932-SBA) MOTIO N to request EAJA fee application to be submitted to a Magistrate for resolution filed by Maraina Arik, (80 in 4:04-cv-04932-SBA) MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Maraina Arik., ORDER REFERRING MOTION:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
February 20, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Plaintiffs response is due on 02/27/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing on 80 Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. Defendant's opposition, if any, shall be due by 02/10/09; Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be due by 02/17/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Modified on 1/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 17, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 73 Stipulation filed by Maraina Arik, Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 8, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 61 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taverniti et al v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?