Guardado v. Perez et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv00194
Filed: January 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONERS MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND 44 VACATING JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
December 14, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 97 Motion to Enforce Judgment By Realease of Prisoner and Staying Order (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
September 2, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 97 FOR BRIEFING ON PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENFORCING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
June 30, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING HEARING BEFORE THE BOARD. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
February 27, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 86 FOR BRIEFING ON PETITIONERS EMERGENCY APPLICATION TO MODIFY ORDER UNDER RULE 60. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 22, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 72 79 PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENFORCING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
October 31, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE TO APPEAR. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/6/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardado v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?