AWS Management, LLC et al v. United States of America et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv01056
Filed: March 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6532 IRS: Refund of Tax Penalty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
October 6, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 Granting Stipulation to extend discovery schedule, settlement conference, and trial deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
May 27, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 64 Granting (Sixth) Stipulation to extend discovery and trial deadlines. Bench Trial set for 11/14/2011 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2011 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/27/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
February 1, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 granting Fith STIPULATION to extend discovery and trial deadlines. Bench Trial set for 7/18/2011 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2010 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
September 18, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE re 58 Stipulation, filed by Mary Chandler Petty, United States of America, AWS Acquisitions, LLC. Fact Discovery due by 2/16/2010. A Mandatory Settleme nt Conference shall be conducted before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no later than 3/17/2010, at the convenience of Magistrate James' calendar. Expert Discovery shall be completed by 6/16/2010. 4 day Court/Bench Trial set for 3/15/2011 08 :30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. All case-dispositive Motions and a further case management conference set for 8/12/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/18/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
July 14, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 55 granting JOINT STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
June 10, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 granting Third Stipulation to Extend Discovery Schedule, Settlement Conference, and Trial Date. Bench Trial set for 11/15/2010 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
February 4, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 granting STIPULATION (Second) to Extend Discovery Schedule and Trial Date. Bench Trial set for 5/10/2010 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
October 31, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 granting STIPULATION to continue Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
September 10, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 granting STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND TRIAL DATE. Bench Trial set for 10/26/2009 08:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/10/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AWS Management, LLC et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?