Pollock v. Ayers

Case Number: 4:2005cv01870
Filed: May 5, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
January 20, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 14 Motion for equitable tolling; granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 18 Joint motion to adopt briefing schedules (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
August 4, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollock v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?