Angotti et al v. Rexam, Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv05264
Filed: December 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2007 165 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/10/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 164 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 155 Motion for Attorney Fees (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 163 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 6, 2007 162 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 9/6/2007 before Saundra Armstrong Brown (Date Filed: 9/6/2007), Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2007 before Saundra Armstrong Brown (Date Filed: 9/6/2007) re 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; 155 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2007)
August 2, 2007 161 Declaration of Claims Administrator Caryn Donly in Support of 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Motion filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 160 Proposed Notice of Final Approval to Class Members by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Modified on 8/3/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 159 Proposed Order re 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Motion - Proposed Judgment by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 158 Proposed Order re 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Motion - Proposed Order Determining Good Faith and Granting Final Approval of Settlement by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 157 MEMORANDUM in Support re 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Motion - Joint Memorandum filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Related document(s) 156 ) (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 2, 2007 156 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Notice of Motion filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
June 6, 2007 155 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of# 2 Case #1# 3 Case #2# 4 Case #3# 5 Case #4# 6 Case #5# 7 Tedrow Declaration# 8 Tedrow Ex. 1# 9 Tedrow Ex. 2# 10 Tedrow Ex. 3# 11 Proposed Order # 12 Certificate of Service)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 8, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 9/6/2007 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 4, 2007 152 NOTICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero Notice of Modification of Notice to Class Members in Accordance with Court's Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Class Members)(Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 4, 2007 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero re 150 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Modification of Notice to Class Members in Accordance with Court's Instructions (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 4, 2007 150 ***PLEASE DISREGARD SEE DOCUMENT # 152 *** NOTICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero Notice of Modification of Notice to Class Members in Accordance with Court's Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice fo Class Members)(Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 5/4/2007) Modified on 5/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/7/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2007 154 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2007 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/3/2007) re 148 Joint MOTION for for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Court Reporter David Disbrow, pro tem.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2007)
May 3, 2007 153 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 148 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007)
April 18, 2007 149 Featured Case ORDER re 147 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION re Hearing on Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 4/18/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 16, 2007 148 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2007 10:00 AM. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/16/2007) Modified on 4/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 147 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Hearing on Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 146 Declaration of Francis J. Martorana in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/13/2007) Modified on 4/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 145 ***INCORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT # 148 *** NOTICE by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero re 143 Stipulation, Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/13/2007) Modified on 4/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 144 Proposed Order re 143 Stipulation, Granting Preliminary Approval and Settlement Hearing by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/13/2007) Modified on 4/16/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2007 143 STIPULATION Re Settlement of Class Action by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
March 29, 2007 142 Featured Case ORDER re 141 granting as modified STIPULATION RE: VACATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2007 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 28, 2007 141 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: VACATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
October 26, 2006 140 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session on 10/19/2006 and 10/20/2006, case fully settled, mediation complete. Filed by Mediator, Robert T. Fries, dated 10/22/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
September 20, 2006 139 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 129 Motion to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 19, 2006 138 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
September 19, 2006 135 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 9/22/06 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
September 18, 2006 137 Featured Case ORDER of USCA granting appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2006)
September 18, 2006 136 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE CORRECT DOCUMENT # 137 *** ORDER of USCA granting appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2006) Modified on 9/19/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2006 134 Reply in Response to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 SMT Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A1 Howell Depo# 3 Exhibit A2 Agreement 1991# 4 Exhbit A3 Howell Decl)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 9/8/2006) Modified on 9/11/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2006 133 Memorandum in Opposition re 129 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 28, 2006 132 Featured Case ORDER re 131 granting STIPULATION RE: CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/28/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 23, 2006 131 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CLASS NOTICE by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
August 22, 2006 130 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 125 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Connection With Rexam's Motion to Clarify Court's Preliminary Injunction Order (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 18, 2006 129 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2006 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Index of Attachments# 3 Declaration of Sally M. Tedrow# 4 Exhibit Attachment to Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit Declaration of Kent Russell - Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit Declaration of Berenice Angotti - Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Borrero - Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit Declaration of Jack Griffith - Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit Declaration of Bernard Schreiner - Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law -Exhibit G (Part 1)# 11 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law - Exhibit G (Part 2)# 12 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law - Exhibit G (Part 3)# 13 Proposed Order # 14 Certificate of Service)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 17, 2006 128 NOTICE by Rexam, Inc. of Election Under the Court Preliminary Injunction Orders (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 8/17/2006) Modified on 8/18/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2006 127 Featured Case ORDER of USCA: granting motion for extension of time to file the opening brief (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2006)
August 15, 2006 126 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 118 Motion to clarify preliminary injunction; granting Rexam's request for approval to distribute a notice of class members, modified in accordance with the instructions (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 10, 2006 125 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Connection With Rexam's Motion to Clarify Court's Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Surreply# 2 SMT Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to SMT Declaration)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2006) Modified on 8/11/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2006 124 Consent Protective Order re 120 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/10/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006)
August 9, 2006 123 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 9/1/06 hearing is vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006)
August 8, 2006 122 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Clarify the Court's Preliminary Injunction Order filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 8/8/2006)
August 4, 2006 121 Response to Rexam's Motion to Clarify the Court's Preliminary Injunction Order filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 8/4/2006) Modified on 8/7/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2006 120 Proposed Order Consent Protective Order by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Protective Order)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
July 31, 2006 119 STIPULATION re 118 MOTION For Clarification of Preliminary Injunction and Authorization to Provide Notice to the Putative Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Shortening Time to Respond by Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero, Rexam, Inc.. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 10/19/2006 09:30 AM., and 10/20/2006 at 9:30 AM., in the offices of Carter, Carter & Fries, 88 Kearny St., Suite 1000, San Francisco. Mediation statements due in mediator's office by noon on Friday, 10/13/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 28, 2006 118 MOTION For Clarification of Preliminary Injunction and Authorization to Provide Notice to the Putative Class; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Rexam, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/28/2006) Modified on 7/31/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-16325 9th Circuit re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 28, 2006 117 Featured Case ORDER of USCA setting briefing schedule (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2006 116 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION for proceeding 4/28/06 by Rexam, Inc. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/28/2006) Modified on 7/31/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2006 AMENDED Notice of Appeal Notification Form to USCA re 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
July 24, 2006 115 AMENDED ANSWER to (DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byRexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
July 21, 2006 114 Featured Case ORDER re 112 Granting STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2006)
July 18, 2006 113 SUBSTITUTED INJUNCTION BOND by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero (Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 7/18/2006) Modified on 7/19/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2006 USCA Appeal Fees received $455.00, receipt number 3387862 re: 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 14, 2006 112 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by Rexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 14, 2006 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant as to 111 Notice of Appeal (cc to USCA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 14, 2006 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 14, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals as to 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 14, 2006 Appeal fee NOT paid as to 111 Notice of Appeal (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 13, 2006 111 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rexam, Inc. re 108 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/13/2006) Modified on 7/14/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2006 110 STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM [DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM ATTACHED AND DEEMED FILED BY THIS PLEADING) by Rexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
July 7, 2006 109 INJUNCTION BOND filed by Berenice Angotti. (Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 7/7/2006) Modified on 7/10/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). C.M. Pecot, Jr. power of attorney on file
June 14, 2006 108 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, effective upon filing of $25,000.00 bond (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) Modified on 6/15/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2006 107 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Robert T. Fries as Mediator dated 6/7/2006. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2006)
May 25, 2006 106 SECOND JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/25/2006) Modified on 5/26/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2006 105 REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' PENDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/25/2006) Modified on 5/26/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2006 104 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2007 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/16/2007 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2007 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2006 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/15/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006)
May 12, 2006 102 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (with Exhibits A - D) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/12/2006) Modified on 5/15/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2006 101 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/06 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2006)
April 28, 2006 103 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2006 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/28/2006). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2006) Modified on 5/16/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2006 100 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Jennifer Simon. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 99 JOINT [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE BY Angotti et al. and by Rexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 4/27/2006) Modified on 4/28/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2006 98 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jennifer Simon); fee paid, receipt #4412658 filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference condcuted on 4/25/06 by RWS. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 96 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Stafford, Michele) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 21, 2006 95 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/25/06 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 94 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Mgmt Statement filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 93 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Joint Notice of Need for ADR Teleconference (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 14, 2006 92 Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 2d FJM Declaration# 2 2 FJM DEc Ex 20A# 3 2 FJM Dec Ex 20B# 4 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 21A# 5 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 21B# 6 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 22A# 7 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 22B# 8 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 22C# 9 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 22D# 10 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 23# 11 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 24# 12 2 FJM Dec Exhibit 25# 13 Unreported Case Law# 14 Index of Attachments and Referenced Documents)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
April 14, 2006 91 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006)
April 12, 2006 90 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2006 10:00 AM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
March 31, 2006 89 Memorandum in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRexam, Inc.. (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 88 AFFIDAVIT (Second) of Lori R. Gibson in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Rexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1# 2 Ex. 2# 3 Ex. 3)(McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 87 AFFIDAVIT (Third) of Charlotte Reilly in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Rexam, Inc.. (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 86 AFFIDAVIT (Second) of Jeff Ries in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Rexam, Inc.. (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 85 AFFIDAVIT (Second) of Don Hardin in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renew Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Rexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2# 3 Exhibit Ex. 3)(McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 16, 2006 84 Featured Case ORDER re 82 Granting STIPULATION re 74 to Extend Time for Response and Reply and Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Renewed Motion. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/16/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 16, 2006 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Pension and Benefits Committee Without Prejudice by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 15, 2006 82 STIPULATION re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and [Proposed ] Order to Extend Time for Response and Reply and Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Renewed Motion by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 13, 2006 81 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM answer to Amended Counterclaim byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero, Bernard W. Schreiner, Jack Griffith, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/13/2006)
March 6, 2006 80 EXHIBITS re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 13 to Attachment A (FJM Decl) filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
March 4, 2006 79 EXHIBITS 18 FJM Decl filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 A18a# 2 A183)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/4/2006)
March 3, 2006 78 EXHIBITS re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 A19# 2 B# 3 B1A# 4 B2# 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/3/2006)
March 3, 2006 77 EXHIBITS re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 A14# 2 A15# 3 A16)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/3/2006)
March 3, 2006 76 EXHIBITS re 74 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 A8# 2 A9# 3 A10# 4 A11# 5 A12)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/3/2006)
March 3, 2006 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Case Law Asarco# 2 Case Law Howe Veritor# 3 Case Law Arvinmeritor# 4 Case Law White Farm# 5 Case Law US Steel# 6 Case Law Textron)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/3/2006) Modified on 3/7/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2006 74 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Index# 3 1A# 4 A2A# 5 A2B# 6 A3A# 7 Attachment A# 8 A3B# 9 A4A# 10 A4B# 11 A5# 12 A6)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 3/3/2006) Modified on 3/7/2006 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2006 73 AMENDED ANSWER to 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byRexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc.. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 3/2/2006)
February 24, 2006 72 Acknowledgment of Receipt of transfer documents received by District of Minnesota on 2/21/06. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2006 Certified Copy of Transferral Order and Docket Entries forwarded to District of Minnesota (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2006)
February 14, 2006 71 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2006)
February 10, 2006 70 Rexam, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byRexam, Inc.. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 7, 2006 69 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/27/06 before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
January 27, 2006 68 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2006 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 1/27/2006). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/06) Modified on 2/2/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/3/2006 (kk, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2006 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re 63 Reply Memorandum, (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 24, 2006 66 Proposed Order TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA by Rexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/24/2006) Modified on 1/25/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2006 65 Proposed Order TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI by Rexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/24/2006) Modified on 1/25/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2006 64 Appendix re 63 Reply Memorandum, (DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES FROM UNOFFICIAL REPORTERS CITED IN ITS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 24, 2006 63 Reply Memorandum (DEFENDANT REXAM'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER with Exhibits 1 - 3) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/24/2006) Modified on 1/25/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2006 62 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants Motion to Stay Parallel Proceeding or Transfer filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19 # 20 # 21 # 22 # 23 # 24 # 25 # 26 # 27 # 28 # 29 # 30 # 31 # 32 # 33 # 34 # 35)(Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 1/18/2006)
January 10, 2006 60 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee, Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 59 Featured Case ORDER re 52 Granting STIPULATION to consolidated hearing re 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER) and Set Expedited Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Claudia Wiilken on 1/10/06. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re 56 Affidavit, 57 Affidavit, 54 MOTION to Transfer Case, 55 Memorandum in Support (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 57 AFFIDAVIT re 54 MOTION to Transfer Case, 55 Memorandum in Support Affidavit of Lori R. Gibson by Rexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 56 AFFIDAVIT re 54 MOTION to Transfer Case, 55 Memorandum in Support Affidavit of Charlotte Reilly by Rexam, Inc.. (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 54 ) (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 10, 2006 54 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Rexam, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (McLoughlin, James) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 6, 2006 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Mark A. Nebrig) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 6, 2006 52 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to consolidated hearing re 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER) and Set Expedited Briefing Schedule/Proposed Order by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee, Daniel Borrero. (Gwaltney, Alton) (Filed on 1/6/2006) Modified on 1/9/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2006 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Mark A. Nebrig); fee paid, receipt #4412005 filed by Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2006 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. (service of Application and Proposed Order for Admission of Mark A. Nebrig Pro Hac Vice) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
December 30, 2005 50 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 3 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 49 NOTICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 29, 2005 48 NOTICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero RE Missouri Court Ruling Denying Rexam's TRO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1)# 2 Exhibit A (part 2))(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/29/2005)
December 29, 2005 47 STATUS REPORT on Proceedings In Eastern District of Missouri by Berenice Angotti. (Tedrow, Sally) (Filed on 12/29/2005)
December 23, 2005 46 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Alton L. Gwaltney, III) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (James P. McLoughlin, Jr.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 42 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Francis J. Martorana# 2 Exhibit 29# 3 Case Law Cole v. Arvinmeritor# 4 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re 36 Amended Notice re 14 MOTION to Stay
December 23, 2005 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero Proof of Service (Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/23/2005)
December 23, 2005 39 EXHIBITS 7-12 re Attchments to Sally M. Tedrow Letter to the Honorable Claudia Wilken Dated December 22, 2005 filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 7# 2 EXHIBIT 8# 3 EXHIBIT 9# 4 EXHIBIT 10# 5 EXHIBIT 11# 6 EXHIBIT 12)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 38 EXHIBITS 2-6 re Attachments to Sally M. Tedrow Letter to the Honorable Claudia Wilken Dated December 22, 2005 filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 2# 2 EXHIBIT 3# 3 EXHIBIT 4# 4 EXHIBIT 5# 5 EXHIBIT 6)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 37 Attachments to Sally M. Tedrow Letter to the Honorable Claudia Wilken Dated December 22, 2005 filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 ATTACHMENT 1# 2 ATTACHMENT 2# 3 ATTACHMENT 3# 4 EXHIBIT 1)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 36 Amended Notice 14 MOTION to Stay OR TRANSFER filed by Rexam, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Alton L. Gwaltney, III) filed by Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee. $210 fee paid, receipt #4411968 (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (James P. McLoughlin, Jr.) filed by Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee. $210 fee paid, receipt #4411969. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 35 Letter Brief Sally M. Tedrow Letter to the Honorable Claudia Wilken Dated December 22, 2005 filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Berenice Angotti, Daniel Borrero. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Kaplan, Muriel) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 34 EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits 17 through 23 to Gibson Affidavit filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18# 2 Exhibit 19# 3 Exhibit 20# 4 Exhibit 21# 5 Exhibit 22# 6 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 33 EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit 12 through 16 filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13# 2 Exhibit 14# 3 Exhibit 15# 4 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 32 EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit 11 to Gibson Affidavit filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 Part 2 of 2)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 31 EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits 9 and 10 filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 30 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SEE DOCKET # 28 *** EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits 7 and 8 filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005) Modified on 12/23/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 29 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SEE DOCKET # 28 *** EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit 6 filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 Part 2 of 2)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005) Modified on 12/23/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 28 EXHIBITS re 25 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits 6 through 8 filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 Part 1 of 2# 2 Exhibit 6 Part 2 of 2# 3 Exhibit 7# 4 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 25 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a TRO (AFFIDAVIT OF LORI R. GIBSON) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4 Part 1 of 6# 5 Exhibit 4 Part 2 of 6# 6 Exhibit 4 Part 3 of 6# 7 Exhibit 4 Part 4 of 6# 8 Exhibit 4 Part 5 of 6# 9 Exhibit 4 Part 6 of 6# 10 Exhibit 5)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 24 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order (AFFIDAVIT OF DON HARDIN) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 23 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order (AFFIDAVIT OF CHARLOTTE REILLY) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 22 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order (AFFIDAVIT OF JEFF RIES) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 21 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (AFFIDAVIT OF MARK JOHNSON ON BEHALF OF REXAM, INC.) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 20 Memorandum in Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005) Modified on 12/23/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2005 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re: Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order of Alton L. Gwaltney, III (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 22, 2005 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re: Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order of James P. McLoughlin, Jr. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/22/2005)
December 21, 2005 27 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Sally M. Tedrow) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 21, 2005 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Francis J. Martorana) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 21, 2005 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rexam, Inc. re 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER), 15 Memorandum in Support,, 16 Declaration in Support, (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 21, 2005 16 Declaration of James P. McLoughlin, Jr. in Support of 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER) (AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES P. MCLOUGHLIN, JR.) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 14 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 21, 2005 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER) (DEFENDANT REXAM INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY OR TRANSFER) filed byRexam, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 21, 2005 14 MOTION to Stay (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PARALLEL PROCEEDING OR TRANSFER) filed by Rexam, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 20, 2005 13 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2006 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/05. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 12 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/20/05. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2005 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 10 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2006. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2006 10:00 AM. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Proposed Order re 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Sally M. Tedrow (receipt no. 4411954) filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Proposed Order re 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Francis J. Martorana (receipt No. 4411955) filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2006 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 6 Defendants' Response of December 19, 2005 to Plaintiffs' Electronic Notice, of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Request for Temporary Restraining Order by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Modified on 12/21/2005 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Proposed Order re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 5 Index of Attachments to 4 Memorandum in Support, filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Related document(s) 4 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byRalph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (Related document(s) 3 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Proposed Order re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Summons Issued as to Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) for Breach of Labor Contracts and for Breach of ERISA Welfare Plans against Rexam, Inc., Rexam, Inc. Pension and Benefits Committee (Filing fee $250, receipt number 4411953). Filed by Ralph E. Cowley, Jack Griffith, Donald S. Mueller, Kent D. Russell, Sr, Bernard W. Schreiner, Berenice Angotti, Raymond Valli, Daniel Borrero. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2005) Modified on 12/21/2005 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2005 (cp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angotti et al v. Rexam, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?