Moore v. California Department of Corrections et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv02105
Filed: March 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/12/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 11, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 7, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Plaintiff to be available via telephone for April 14, 2010 settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vadas on 4/7/10. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 31, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2010.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/26/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 11, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference re: Further Settlement for Wednesday, March 17, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
October 20, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF PRO SE PRISONER EARLY SETTLEMENT PROCEEDING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/20/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 5, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2009 at 03:45 PM., via telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/2/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus issued to transport Plaintiff Jumah Ali-Thomas Moore. Settlement Conference set for 09/22/09 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/14/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2009 09:00 AM. Solano State Prison. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/9/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 83 Motion for Reconsideration; GRANTING 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Photocopy Exhibits to Opposition; GRANTING 88 Moti on for Reconsideration; GRANTING 91 Motion for Additional Exhibits; GRANTING 97 Motion to Seal and for Protective Order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant. Thomas are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court's Order of 02/25/09 is VACA TED IN PART as to Defendants Mathews, Arroyo, and Vogel-Pace; No later than (7) seven days of the date of this Order, Deputy Attorney General Trace O. Maiorino shall make an appearance on their behalf and participate in the Settlement Proceedings. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for a Settlement Conference. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport plaintiff issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas, on 5/12/09. Settlement Conference set for 05/19/09 at 9:00 AM (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstong,GRANTING 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Global Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Time to Complete Global Settlement is Extended to 05/25/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Modified on 4/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's response due 03/13/09; Defendants reply brief due (15) fifteen-days Plaintiff's opposition is filed. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009) Modified on 3/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING PART 51 Motion for an Order for the U.S. Marshal to Obtain Confidential Addresses of Defendant I. Grillo; GRANTING 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Requests to Defendants. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment to be filed by 03/02/09; Defendants' reply brief due no later than (15) fifteen-days after after Plaintiff's opposition. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties to attempt global settlement conference of all plaintiff's cases within sixty days. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 27, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That a Settlement Conference is set for 02/27/09 at 9:00 AM. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009) Modified on 1/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and DENYING 41 Motion to Obtain Confidential Address of Defendants C. Matthews, M. Arroyo, and C. Vogel-Pace and GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Provide the Court with Current Addresses of Defendants Grillo, Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace and DENYING 43 Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants Pistone, Gibbs, Baez, Zamora and Tsai. Answer of Defendant s Pistone, Gibbs, Baez, Zamora and Tsai, due no later than 12/29/08; Dispositive Motions due by 01/29/09. Plaintiff must provide the Court with current addresses of Defendants Grillo, Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace by no later than 01/20/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion 34 and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/9/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That no later than (30) thirty-days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must provide the Court with current addresses for Defendants Grillo, Mathews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/17/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/4/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 17 Motion ORDER OF SERVICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?