International Organization of Masters, Mates and Pilots, Pacific Maritime Region v. National Park Service et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv02107
Filed: March 21, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and Costs re 110 . Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 7/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
June 30, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 108 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 6/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 19, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (124 in 4:06-cv-02152-CW) (105 in 4:06-cv-02107-CW) granting Stipulated Final Judgment of Permanent Injunction; JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
January 8, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (100 in 4:06-cv-02107-CW) (119 in 4:06-cv-02152-CW) granting STIPULATION Continue Case Management Conference Scheduled for January 15, 2009 to June 23, 2009. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
March 30, 2006 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. Inlandboatmen's Union of the Pacific v Mainella, C-06-2152 MMC, is referred, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), to District Judge Claudia Wilken for consideration of whether the case is related to International Organization of Masters Mates and Pilots v. National Park Service, C-06-2107 CW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Organization of Masters, Mates and Pilots, Pacific Maritime Region v. National Park Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?