Ontiveros v. Hayward Police Department

Case Number: 4:2006cv02122
Filed: March 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court VERDICT FORM. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PERMIT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO BRING THEIR LAPTOPS TO COURT DURING TRIAL re 130 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) Modified on 4/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 18, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court DRAFT JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 80 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 3, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 78 Motion to Continue (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 10, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte APPORVING Request for Plaintiff Eric Ontiveros and Defendants Beal, Nishimoto, Lundgren, Corsolini, Mulhern Cantrell, Delbo and Schroer to be Excused from Participating in Mediation Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, on 12/10/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 granting STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FROM APRIL 8, 2009 TO MAY 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 9, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 25 Substitute Attorney Paul L. Alaga and Lewis O. Romero for Pro Se Plaintiff Eric Ontiveros filed by Eric J. Ontiveros. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/09. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 24, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties agree to additional follow-up settlement conference after summary judgment motion is ruled on. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/24/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 28, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER settlement conference scheduled for February 18, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. Courtroom D, San Francisco (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
October 20, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE AND REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/20/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontiveros v. Hayward Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?