Hernandez v. Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv03350
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
April 20, 2010 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 288 Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minor's Claim (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 6, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 286 Stipulation, filed by United States Of America, Cruz Hernandez. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/6/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 1, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
January 25, 2010 282 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Minor's Compromise Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/25/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: That Final Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009) Modified on 10/19/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
July 13, 2009 245 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the time for filing post-trial brief is extended to 07/17/07. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/10/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR POST-TRIAL BRIEFS: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file Post-Trial Closing Briefs by 07/10/09; Responses due 07/31/09; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due 07/31/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED TRIAL STIPULATIONS AND ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, signed on 5/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING Cruz Hernandez Permission to Bring Certain Equipment into the Court. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/15/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 209 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009) Modified on 5/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Setting Briefing re 209 Motion for Leave to File Motion For Reconsideration. Defendant shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition by no later than 05/04/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/1/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009) Modified on 5/4/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 193 Fourth Amended Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minor's Claim and Attorney Costs (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That parties shall meet and confer by 04/22/09; Defendants opposition or non-opposition on or before 04/25/09. The motion hearing set for 04/21/09 is VACATED re 193 Fourth Amended Motion for Order Authorizing Compromise of Minor's Claim and For Attorneys Costs Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/17/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009) Modified on 4/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 173 Motion for Good Faith Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 152 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
September 17, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 123 Motion HEARING RE: DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; denying 142 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?