Fernandez v. Taser International, Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv04371
Filed: July 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
February 17, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING RE PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM: The hearing to take place on 03/26/09 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom B 15th Floor, re 84 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE HEARING OF PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM: That the hearing shall be heard before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James and without notice requirements on shortening time. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/10/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2008 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/29/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 27, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion in Limine; denying 70 Motion in Limine; granting 76 Motion to Continue; DENYING as moot 77 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 21, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: presence at pretrial conference. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Order, Settlement Conference rescheduled for 10/29/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/17/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Taser International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?