Ho Keung Tse v. Apple Inc., et al.

Case Number: 4:2006cv06573
Filed: October 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/9/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
September 19, 2013 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Re: 183 , 194 and 195 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
May 23, 2013 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 217 Notice (Other), filed by Ho Keung Tse, 219 Notice (Other), filed by Ho Keung Tse. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/23/2013. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
February 5, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: C-12-2653-SBA AND C-06-6573-SBA by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 76 Motion to Consolidate Cases and DENYING 76 Motion to Stay in case 4:12-cv-02653-SBA. Plaintiff shall file within (30) thirty-days of this Order an Amended Consolidated Complaint into the the lead case, C-06-6573-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 02/01/13 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
October 30, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 189 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
June 26, 2012 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 170 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
May 5, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 144 Motion TO LIFT STAY; finding as moot 154 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho Keung Tse v. Apple Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?